+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 6/9/2016.
- Chapter 232, 2016 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- President signed.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 16).
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Amendments (2)
6427-S.E AMH FIN H4555.2
ADOPTED 03/02/2016
6427-S AMS FAIN S4693.1
ADOPTED 02/16/2016
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor