+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 162, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- Speaker signed.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- LG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- LGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor