+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HSMH - Majority; do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor