+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Chapter 152, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- CB - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Capital Budget (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- EENT - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. (View Original Bill)