+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor