+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- PS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor