+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CDHT - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 18). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDIT - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development & International Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development & International Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Economic Development & International Trade. (View Original Bill)