+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 6/28/2016.
- Chapter 18, 2016 Laws 1st Special Session.
- Filed with Secretary of State.
- On motion, Governor's veto overridden; yeas, 83; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 4.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- On motion, Governor's veto overridden; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor vetoed.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- President signed.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- CDHT - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (FI 16).
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- FI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance.
+ − Sponsor
Miloscia
Type:
Primary Sponsor