+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Governor vetoed.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
- Speaker signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- President signed.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Early Learning & Human Services.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 27, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- ELHS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HSMH 16).
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HSMH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- And refer to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing.
- HLTH - Majority; without recommendation.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
+ − Amendments (2)
6329-S AMH ELHS H4554.1
NOT ADOPTED 03/03/2016
6329-S AMH APP H4642.1
ADOPTED 03/03/2016
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor