+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Chapter 106, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- AGNR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- AWNP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor