+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Chapter 232, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Higher Education. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- HE - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 18). (View 2nd Substitute)
On February 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor