+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- HSA - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor