+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LBRC - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. (View Original Bill)