+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TRAN 16).
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.