+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 6/9/2016.
- Chapter 221, 2016 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
- Speaker signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- President signed.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- PS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LAW 16).
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
+ − Amendment
6261-S AMH PS H4546.1
ADOPTED 03/04/2016
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor