+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Held on third reading.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HIE - Majority; do pass.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor