+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 14).
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor