+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 261, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- ELHS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 18). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)