+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- CL - Majority; do pass.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor