+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Commerce. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. (View Original Bill)
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.