+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. (View Original Bill)
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor