+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. (View Original Bill)
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.