+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 6/12/2014.
- Chapter 91, 2014 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- President signed.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- APP - Majority; do pass.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor