+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. (View Original Bill)