+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Returned to Senate Rules 3.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- TRAN - Majority; do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
6180 AMH ENGR H4577.E
ADOPTED AND ENGROSSED 03/03/2016
6180 AMH REYK BALL 172
WITHDRAWN 03/03/2016
6180 AMH MOSC BALL 173
ADOPTED 03/03/2016
6180 AMH TR H4577.6
ADOPTED AS AMENDED 03/03/2016
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor