+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 3, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date 4/3/2020.
- Chapter 357, 2020 Laws PV. (View Session Law)
- Governor partially vetoed. (View Veto Message)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report; received 3:00 PM 3/11/2020.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted.
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted.
- Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- President signed.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- Vote on final passage will be reconsidered.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Conference committee report; received 2:12 PM 3/11/2020.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed. Representatives Ormsby, Robinson, Stokesbary.
- Conference committee request granted.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed. Senators Rolfes, Frockt, Braun.
- Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 20). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor