+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor