+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Chapter 56, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- Speaker signed.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- ED - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- EDU - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor