+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- GOS - Majority; do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 5:45 PM.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 1:00 PM.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor