+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate Rules 3.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- EDU - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)
On December 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.