+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate Rules 3.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 20). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)
On December 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.