+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 18). (View 2nd Substitute)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. (View Original Bill)
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor