+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Rules.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EENT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. (View Original Bill)
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor