+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Rules.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- TR - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- TRAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor