+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 147, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- HCW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HLTC 20). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. (View Original Bill)
On December 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor