+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate Rules 3.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- LBRC - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. (View Original Bill)
On December 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.