+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 31, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 243, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- CPB - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (FIET 20). (View 1st Substitute)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- FIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. (View Original Bill)
On December 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.