+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- GOE - Majority; do pass.
- GOE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- TRED - Majority; do pass.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor