+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- FI - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. (View Original Bill)
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor