+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 3, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 352, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- Speaker signed.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On February 29, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 20). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
On December 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor