+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 6/12/2014.
- Chapter 86, 2014 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Vote on third reading will be reconsidered.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- ENVI - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 9:00 AM.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- NRP - Majority; do pass.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks.
+ − Amendments (4)
6034.E AMH SEAQ H4457.1
WITHDRAWN 03/07/2014
6034.E AMH SENN LIPS 136
WITHDRAWN 03/07/2014
6034.E AMH ENVI H4339.1
ADOPTED 03/07/2014
6034 AMS PEAR S4237.2
ADOPTED 02/12/2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor