+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- LGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)
On December 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor