+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- PS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- PS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
6010 AMS KLIN S4639.2
NOT ADOPTED 02/18/2014
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor