+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- TR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 5. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TRAN 18). (View 1st Substitute)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
On December 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.