+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- GOV - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Governmental Operations.
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor