+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 9:00 AM.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor