+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 25, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 128, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- APP - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 15).
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:45 PM.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor