+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/1/2019.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 422, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 11:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Placed on second reading.
- Committee amendment not adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 19). (View 1st Substitute)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading.
- Rules suspended.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor