+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 5.
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 8:30 AM.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Rules.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- GOS - Majority; do pass.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor