+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Transportation.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor